US SB1511 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Became Public Law No: 117-61.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Became Public Law No: 117-61.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 with respect to payments to certain public safety officers who have become permanently and totally disabled as a result of personal injuries sustained in the line of duty, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting America’s First Responders Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 420 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-61. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1511 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8054) |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 1511 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8054) |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2021-10-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-10-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 3 (Roll no. 338). (text: CR H5948-5950) |
2021-10-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5954) |
2021-10-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-10-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1511. |
2021-10-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5948-5953) |
2021-10-27 | House | Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-06-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-06-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4499-4501) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.2118 Amendment SA 2118 proposed by Senator Cortez Masto for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S4499; text: CR S4499) To improve the bill. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.2118 Amendment SA 2118 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4499-4501) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2936 (Same As) 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.