US SB1507 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to promulgate certain limitations with respect to pre-production plastic pellet pollution, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to require the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to promulgate certain limitations with respect to pre-production plastic pellet pollution, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2238 (Related) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB984 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7861 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB984 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7861 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1507/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1507/BILLS-117s1507is.pdf |