US SB1494 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to protect alien minors and to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to end abuse of the asylum system and establish refugee application and processing centers outside the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
Secure and Protect Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181. |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Espionage and treason
Family relationships
Federal preemption
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Judicial review and appeals
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Specialized courts
State and local government operations
Border security and unlawful immigration
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Espionage and treason
Family relationships
Federal preemption
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Judges
Judicial review and appeals
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Specialized courts
State and local government operations