US SB1471 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 109.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 109.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to enhance protections of Native American tangible cultural heritage, and for other purposes.
Title
Safeguard Tribal Objects of Patrimony Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 109. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-33. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2930 (Related) 2022-12-21 - Became Public Law No: 117-258.