US SB1461 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-112. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on December 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-112. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the extension of the enforcement instruction on supervision requirements for outpatient therapeutic services in critical access and small rural hospitals through 2015. (Sec. 1) This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services to continue to instruct Medicare contractors not to enforce requirements for direct physician supervision of outpatient therapeutic services in critical access and small rural hospitals through 2015.
Title
A bill to provide for the extension of the enforcement instruction on supervision requirements for outpatient therapeutic services in critical access and small rural hospitals through 2015.
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-112. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-12-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2015-12-09 | House | Presented to President. |
2015-12-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-12-08 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9063) |
2015-12-08 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9062-9063) |
2015-12-08 | House | Mr. Burgess asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H9062) |
2015-12-08 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. (consideration: CR H9062) |
2015-12-08 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. (consideration: CR H9062) |
2015-09-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-09-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-09-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-09-11 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-09-11 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-09-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6610; text as passed Senate: CR S6610) |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 188. |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-109. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2878 (Same As) 2015-07-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.