US SB1434 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of reverse auctions for awarding federal contracts for construction and design services. Generally, a reverse auction is one in which there are multiple sellers lowering their bids to win a supply or service contract.
Title
Construction Consensus Procurement Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-12-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7229) |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1269 Amendment SA 1269 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.1269 Amendment SA 1269 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Portman. (consideration: CR S7229; text: CR S7229) To modify the definition of reverse auction to cover the awarding of contracts and orders that are based solely on the price obtained through the auction process. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7229) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-100. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5644 (Related) 2020-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Architecture
Building construction
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Public contracts and procurement
Architecture
Building construction
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Public contracts and procurement