US SB1429 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2295-2296)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2295-2296)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide compensation for United States victims of Libyan state-sponsored terrorism, and for other purposes.
Title
Justice for the Living Victims of Lockerbie Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2295-2296) |
Same As/Similar To
HB8716 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB2808 (Related) 2021-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB5357 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Held at the desk.
SB2808 (Related) 2021-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB5357 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1429/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1429/BILLS-117s1429is.pdf |