US SB1423 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for Medicare coverage of dental, vision, and hearing care. Coverage includes (1) routine dental cleanings and exams, basic and major dental services, emergency dental care, and dentures; (2) routine eye exams, eyeglasses, and contact lenses; and (3) routine hearing exams, hearing aids, and exams for hearing aids. With respect to such care, the bill establishes special payment rules, limitations, and coinsurance requirements. The bill also increases the Medicaid Federal Medical Assistance Percentage for dental, vision, and hearing services.
Title
Medicare and Medicaid Dental, Vision, and Hearing Benefit Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1393 (Related) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2951 (Related) 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB22 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2951 (Related) 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB22 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Dental care
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1423/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1423/BILLS-116s1423is.pdf |