US SB1416 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Affordable Prescriptions for Patients Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Affordable Prescriptions for Patients Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 132.
2019-06-28SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2019-06-27SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-05-09SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB3991 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB4398 (Related) 2019-10-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback