US SB1405 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to provide for the exchange of certain Federal land and State land in the State of Utah.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utah School and Institutional Trust Lands Administration Exchange Act of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-09SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 305.
2024-01-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 118-153.
2023-09-21SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2023-07-12SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
2023-05-02SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB3049 (Same As) 2024-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 743.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback