US SB140 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the James K. Polk Home and adjacent property in Columbia, Tennessee. In conducting this study, Interior shall evaluate the national significance of the study area and determine the suitability and feasibility of designating it as a unit of the National Park System.
Title
James K. Polk Presidential Home Study Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB1578 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB143 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB1578 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB143 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Subjects
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public lands and natural resources
Tennessee
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/140/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s140/BILLS-116s140is.pdf |