US SB14 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 88.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of State to develop a program to combat corruption in foreign countries. The State Department must annually report to Congress a tiered list of all foreign countries. The first tier shall contain countries that meet minimum standards for combating public corruption, while the second tier shall contain countries that do not yet meet these standards but are making significant efforts to do so. Third-tier countries do not meet the minimum anti-corruption standards and are not making significant efforts to do so. Factors for assessing efforts to address corruption include a country's compliance with specified relevant international agreements. The State Department must report on whether, for purposes of potential sanctions, foreign persons are engaged in significant corruption in third-tier countries or in relation to the planning, construction, or operation of the Nord Stream 2 pipeline. The State Department must also designate an anti-corruption point of contact in the U.S. diplomatic post in each second- or third-tier country and where the State Department determines that such a point of contact is necessary. The point of contact shall be responsible for enhancing coordination and promoting the implementation of a whole-of-government approach to enhancing the ability of foreign countries to combat public corruption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Combating Global Corruption Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 88.
2021-06-24SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-06-22SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-01-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB4322 (Related) 2021-07-01 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB5209 (Related) 2021-09-10 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback