US SB1390 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STRONGER Patents Act of 2017 Support Technology and Research for Our Nation's Growth and Economic Resilience Patents Act of 2017
Title
STRONGER Patents Act of 2017 Support Technology and Research for Our Nation's Growth and Economic Resilience Patents Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5340 (Related) 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
HB6370 (Related) 2018-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6370 (Related) 2018-07-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal district courts
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Higher education
Intellectual property
Judicial procedure and administration
Licensing and registrations
Small business
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Civil actions and liability
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal district courts
Federal preemption
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Higher education
Intellectual property
Judicial procedure and administration
Licensing and registrations
Small business
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1390/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1390/BILLS-115s1390is.pdf |