US SB1381 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to ensure that, if it creates a presumption of service-connection between the occurrence of a disease and exposure to an herbicide agent while serving in the Armed Forces during the Vietnam era at a military base in Thailand, such presumption must also apply to exposure at any military base in Thailand, regardless of where on the base the veteran was located or what military job specialty the veteran performed. Additionally, the bill extends eligibility for VA health care, vocational training and rehabilitation, and monetary allowance to children with spina bifida who have at least one veteran parent who may have been exposed to an herbicide agent while serving in Thailand between January 9, 1962, and May 7, 1975.
Title
A bill to modify the presumption of service connection for veterans who were exposed to herbicide agents while serving in the Armed Forces in Thailand during the Vietnam era, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2201 (Related) 2019-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Birth defects
Child health
Conflicts and wars
Disability and paralysis
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Neurological disorders
Thailand
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Vietnam
Vocational and technical education
Asia
Birth defects
Child health
Conflicts and wars
Disability and paralysis
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Neurological disorders
Thailand
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Vietnam
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1381/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1381/BILLS-116s1381is.pdf |