US SB1378 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 190.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RIP MSP Act Repeal Insurance Plans of the Multi-State Program Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIP MSP Act Repeal Insurance Plans of the Multi-State Program Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 190.
2019-09-10SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-86.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-05-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2524 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB1313 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback