US SB1356 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Honest Ads Act This bill applies requirements, limitations, and protections regarding political advertising in traditional media to internet or digital political advertising. The bill sets forth special rules for disclosure statements for certain internet or digital ads. Each television or radio station, provider of cable or satellite television, or online platform must ensure that the political advertising it hosts is not directly or indirectly purchased by a foreign national. Online platforms must publish a record of requests to purchase political advertising.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honest Ads Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2952 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2592 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback