US SB1335 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park Establishment Act This bill establishes the Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park in Missouri as a unit of the National Park System. The Department of the Interior may acquire, by donation, purchase, or exchange, any land or interest in land located within the park's boundary or any nationally significant property identified in the special resource study that is within the Ste. Genevieve Historic District National Historic Landmark.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ste. Genevieve National Historical Park Establishment Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 388.
2018-04-25SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-233.
2018-03-08SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-02-14SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2017-06-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB2888 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 392.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback