US SB1325 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a partnership with nations in the Western Hemisphere to promote economic competitiveness, democratic governance, and security, and for other purposes.
Title
Western Hemisphere Partnership Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1428 (Related) 2023-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.