US SB1320 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the Chiricahua National Park in the State of Arizona as a unit of the National Park System, and for other purposes.
Title
Chiricahua National Park Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-04-04 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-04-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1887; text: CR S1887) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 297. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-88. |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6451 (Related) 2022-02-03 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.