US SB1318 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 326.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 326.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nuclear Terrorism Conventions Implementation and Safety of Maritime Navigation Act of 2015 Amends the federal criminal code to expand provisions against violence against maritime navigation by prohibiting the use against or on a ship, or the discharge from a ship, of any explosive or radioactive material, biological, chemical, or nuclear weapon or nuclear explosive device in a manner that causes or is likely to cause death or serious injury or damage, the discharge from a ship of oil, liquefied natural gas, or other hazardous or noxious material that causes or is likely to cause death or serious injury or damage, or the use of a ship in a manner that causes death or serious injury or damage, when the purpose of such an act is to intimidate a population or compel a government or an international organization to do, or to abstain from doing, any act. Prohibits: (1) transporting on board a ship any prohibited material knowing that it is intended to be used to cause, or in a threat to cause, death or serious injury or damage; or (2) transporting another person on board who has committed an offense against maritime navigation. Imposes similar prohibitions against violence against maritime fixed platforms. Authorizes: (1) civil forfeiture of any real or personal property used or intended to be used to commit or to facilitate the commission of a maritime navigation offense; and (2) the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications in the investigation of maritime navigation and maritime fixed platform offenses and acts of nuclear terrorism. Imposes a prison term against any person who knowingly and unlawfully: (1) possesses radioactive material or makes or possesses a device with the intent to cause death, serious bodily injury, or substantial damage to property or the environment; or (2) uses such material or device in a manner that causes the release of, or increases the risk of release of, radioactive material to cause death or damage or to compel a person, an international organization, or a county to do or refrain from doing an act. Prohibits threats and attempts or conspiracies to use radioactive material or devices in violation of this Act. Prohibits any person, without lawful authority, from intentionally carrying, sending, or moving nuclear material into or out of a country. Includes acts of nuclear terrorism prohibited by this Act: (1) within the definition of "federal crime of terrorism," and (2) as a predicate in prosecutions for providing material support and resources to terrorists.
Title
Nuclear Terrorism Conventions Implementation and Safety of Maritime Navigation Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 326. |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3302-3303) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1056 (Related) 2015-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HB2048 (Related) 2015-06-02 - Became Public Law No: 114-23. (TXT | PDF)
SB1123 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2772-2773)
HB2048 (Related) 2015-06-02 - Became Public Law No: 114-23. (TXT | PDF)
SB1123 (Related) 2015-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2772-2773)
Subjects
Chemical and biological weapons
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Firearms and explosives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Nuclear weapons
Oil and gas
Radioactive wastes and releases
Terrorism
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Firearms and explosives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Nuclear weapons
Oil and gas
Radioactive wastes and releases
Terrorism