US SB1317 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

American Mineral Security Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Mineral Security Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
2019-10-22SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-131.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-05-14SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
2019-05-02SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB4299 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Indian lands and resources rights
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Metals
Mining
Performance measurement
Radioactive wastes and releases
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Small business
Solid waste and recycling
Strategic materials and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Technology transfer and commercialization
Water quality
Water use and supply

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback