US SB1294 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the imposition of sanctions with respect to foreign persons that have engaged in significant theft of trade secrets of United States persons, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting American Intellectual Property Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-336. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10022-10023) |
2022-12-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1294. |
2022-12-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10022-10024) |
2022-12-22 | House | Mr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S9657-9658) |
2022-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.6580 Amendment SA 6580 proposed by Senator Heinrich for Senator Van Hollen. (consideration: CR S9610; text: CR S9657-9658) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.6580 Amendment SA 6580 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9610) |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4521 (Related) 2022-05-05 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.