US SB1286 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a funding program to facilitate the commercialization of energy and related technologies that exhibit promising commercial potential and are developed at DOE facilities.
Title
Energy Technology Maturation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178. |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-76. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2495 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Energy
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Technology transfer and commercialization
Energy
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Technology transfer and commercialization