US SB1285 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-179. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oregon Tribal Economic Development Act (Sec. 2) This bill allows the Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua, and Siuslaw Indians, the Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon, the Confederated Tribes of Siletz Indians of Oregon, the Confederated Tribes of Warm Springs, the Cow Creek Band of Umpqua Tribe of Indians, the Klamath Tribes, and the Burns Paiute Tribes to lease, sell, convey, warrant, or transfer their real property that is not held in trust by the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oregon Tribal Economic Development Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-179. (TXT | PDF)
2018-06-01HouseSigned by President.
2018-05-21HousePresented to President.
2018-05-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-05-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3953)
2018-05-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1285.
2018-05-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3953-3954)
2018-05-15HouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2018-01-10HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 377.
2018-01-10HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-507.
2017-12-13HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2017-12-13HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-12-12HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-11-30HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2017-11-30HouseReceived in the House.
2017-11-29SenatePassed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7499; text: CR S7499)
2017-10-17SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 249.
2017-10-17SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 115-175.
2017-09-13SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2017-07-12SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-76.
2017-05-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3225 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 425.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback