US SB1283 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands eligibility for the Marine Gunnery Sergeant John David Fry Scholarship, commonly referred to as the Fry Scholarship, which entitles specified dependents of an active-duty servicemember who died in the line of duty on or after September 11, 2001, to educational assistance under the Post-9/11 GI Bill. Specifically, the bill expands eligibility for the Fry Scholarship to the following dependents: a child or surviving spouse of a servicemember who dies on or after September 11, 2001, serving in a line of duty other than active duty, and a child or surviving spouse of a Selected Reserve member who dies on or after September 11, 2001, from a service-connected disability within four years after the date of the last discharge from active duty.
Title
Fry Scholarship Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2221 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB3504 (Related) 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-154. (TXT | PDF)
HB3504 (Related) 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-154. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability and paralysis
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Disability and paralysis
Higher education
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1283/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1283/BILLS-116s1283is.pdf |