US SB1274 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-22 - By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 111-387.
Status: Introduced on June 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-22 - By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 111-387.
Summary
American Communities' Right to Public Information Act - Amends the SAFE Port Act with respect to existing prohibitions against the disclosure of information contained in maritime transportation security plans (including facility security plans, vessel security plans, and port vulnerability assessments) and other information related to security plans, procedures, or programs for vessels or facilities. Declares that such prohibitions shall not be construed to authorize the designation of information as sensitive security information to: (1) conceal a violation of law, inefficiency, or administrative error; (2) prevent embarrassment to a person, organization, or agency; (3) restrain competition; or (4) prevent or delay the release of information that does not require protection in the interest of transportation security.
Title
American Communities' Right to Public Information Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Byrd [D-WV] | Sen. John Rockefeller [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-22 | By Senator Rockefeller from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 111-387. | |
2010-12-17 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 708. | |
2010-12-17 | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. | |
2009-07-21 | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | |
2009-06-16 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Subjects
Government information and archives
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1274/all-info |