US SB1273 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 206.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CASE Act of 2019 Copyright Alternative in Small-Claims Enforcement Act of 2019 This bill creates the Copyright Claims Board, a body within the U.S. Copyright Office, to decide copyright disputes. Damages awarded by the board are capped at $30,000. Participation in board proceedings is voluntary with an opt-out procedure for defendants, and parties may choose instead to have a dispute heard in court. If the parties agree to have their dispute heard by the board, they shall forego the right to be heard before a court and the right to a jury trial. Board proceedings shall have no effect on class actions. The board shall be authorized to hear copyright infringement claims, actions for a declaration of noninfringement, claims that a party knowingly sent false takedown notices, and related counterclaims. The bill provides for various procedures, including with respect to requests for information from the other party and requests for the board to reconsider a decision. The board may issue monetary awards based on actual or statutory damages. The parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs except where there is bad faith misconduct. A board's final determination precludes relitigating the claims in court or at the board. Parties may challenge a board decision in federal district court only if (1) the decision was a result of fraud, corruption, or other misconduct; (2) the board exceeded its authority or failed to render a final determination; or (3) in a default ruling or failure to prosecute, the default or failure was excusable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CASE Act of 2019 Copyright Alternative in Small-Claims Enforcement Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 206.
2019-09-12SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham without amendment. With written report No. 116-105.
2019-07-18SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-01SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB2426 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 266.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback