US SB1260 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 374.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act This bill authorizes the National Park Service (NPS) to convey to the Veterans of Foreign Wars Post 5699 approximately 1.542 acres of federal real property located within the Gulf Islands National Seashore in Jackson County, Mississippi, in exchange for a non-federal parcel of 2.161 acres. The Post shall pay the costs incurred by the NPS to carry out such exchange. Land and interests acquired by the United States under this bill shall be administered as part of the Gulf Islands National Seashore.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 374.
2018-04-11SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-226.
2018-03-08SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-02-14SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2017-05-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
HB2615 (Related) 2018-10-12 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback