US SB1251 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses contaminants of emerging concern (emerging contaminants), which are not regulated under a national primary drinking water regulation and may have an adverse effect on human health. The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must review federal efforts to (1) identify, monitor, and assist in the development of treatment methods for emerging contaminants; and (2) assist states in responding to the human health risks posed by those contaminants. In addition, the EPA must establish a strategic plan for improving those efforts. The EPA and the Department of Health and Human Services must jointly establish an interagency working group to coordinate federal activities that identify and analyze the public health effects of emerging contaminants. The Office of Science and Technology Policy must establish a National Emerging Contaminant Research Initiative to (1) improve the identification, analysis, monitoring, and treatment methods of emerging contaminants; and (2) support the implementation of its cross-agency plan for addressing research gaps related to detecting, assessing exposure to, and identifying the adverse health effects of such contaminants. Specified federal agencies must make grants for research proposals that are likely to result in significant progress toward achieving the plan's objectives. The EPA must (1) report on actions it may take to increase technical assistance and support for states with respect to emerging contaminants in drinking water samples, and (2) develop a program to provide technical assistance and support to states for the testing and analysis of emerging contaminants.
Title
Safe Drinking Water Assistance Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB5361 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
SB1507 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 119.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB5361 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
SB1507 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 119.
Subjects
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Research administration and funding
Water quality
Water use and supply
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Research administration and funding
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1251/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1251/BILLS-116s1251is.pdf |