US SB1250 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 323.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nicholas and Zachary Burt Memorial Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Prevention Act of 2015 (Sec. 4) This bill directs the Consumer Product Safety Commission (CPSC) to establish a grant program to provide assistance to states or tribal organizations that require compliant carbon monoxide alarms to be installed in dwelling units. A "compliant carbon monoxide alarm" is an alarm that complies with: (1) the Standard for Single and Multiple Station Carbon Monoxide Alarms of the American National Standards Institute and UL (ANSI/UL 2034) or a successor standard, and (2) the Standard for Gas and Vapor Detectors and Sensors of the American National Standards Institute and UL (ANSI/UL 2075) or a successor standard. In selecting grant recipients, the CPSC must give favorable consideration to states or tribal organizations that: (1) require compliant alarms in specified facilities with fuel-burning appliances or attached garages, including educational facilities, childcare facilities, health care facilities, adult dependent care facilities, government buildings, restaurants, theaters, lodging establishments, or dwelling units; and (2) have strategies to protect vulnerable populations such as children, the elderly, or low-income households. States or tribal organizations receiving grants may use such funds to: (1) purchase and install such alarms in dwelling units of low-income families or elderly persons, childcare facilities, public schools, senior centers, or student dwelling units owned by public universities; (2) train state, tribal, or local fire code enforcement officials regarding compliance and installation; or (3) educate the public about the risk of carbon monoxide poisoning. The CPSC must report to Congress regarding the implementation of such grant program.
Title
Nicholas and Zachary Burt Memorial Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Prevention Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 323. |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 114-179. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4701 (Related) 2016-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
Subjects
Air quality
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commerce
Educational facilities and institutions
Emergency communications systems
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health facilities and institutions
Housing for the elderly and disabled
Housing industry and standards
Low- and moderate-income housing
Product safety and quality
State and local government operations
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commerce
Educational facilities and institutions
Emergency communications systems
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health facilities and institutions
Housing for the elderly and disabled
Housing industry and standards
Low- and moderate-income housing
Product safety and quality
State and local government operations