US SB1236 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Secretary of Transportation to develop best practices for incorporating resilience into emergency relief projects, and for other purposes.
Title
Rebuilding Stronger Infrastructure Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HR508 (Similar To) 2021-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1953 (Related) 2021-05-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1236/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1236/BILLS-117s1236is.pdf |