US SB1226 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-119.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Became Public Law No: 117-119.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to designate the United States courthouse located at 1501 North 6th Street in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, as the "Sylvia H. Rambo United States Courthouse", and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to designate the United States courthouse located at 1501 North 6th Street in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, as the "Sylvia H. Rambo United States Courthouse", and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 364 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-119. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 364 - 61, 1 Present (Roll no. 96). (text: CR H3993) |
2022-03-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4000-4001) |
2022-03-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-03-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1226. |
2022-03-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3993-3994) |
2022-03-30 | House | Ms. Williams (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-10-08 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-10-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-10-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6991-6992; text: CR S6992) |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 131. |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report. |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Committee consideration held. Business Meeting printed. S. Hrg. 117-108. |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2597 (Related) 2021-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.