US SB1224 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to enable the Federal Trade Commission to deter filing of sham citizen petitions to cover an attempt to interfere with approval of a competing generic drug or biosimilar, to foster competition, and facilitate the efficient review of petitions filed in good faith to raise legitimate public health concerns, and for other purposes.
Title
Stop STALLING Act Stop Significant and Time-wasting Abuse Limiting Legitimate Innovation of New Generics Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 130. |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2374 (Related) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 577.
SB3384 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3384 (Related) 2020-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business ethics
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Licensing and registrations
Public participation and lobbying
Business ethics
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Health
Licensing and registrations
Public participation and lobbying