US SB1208 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 with respect to payments to certain public safety officers who have become permanently and totally disabled as a result of personal injuries sustained in the line of duty, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting America's First Responders Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-05-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2893-2895; text: CR 5/20/2019 S2981-2982) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 83. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2709 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2812 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB2812 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Assault and harassment offenses
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Disability assistance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Health personnel
Higher education
Law enforcement officers
Student aid and college costs
Violent crime
Worker safety and health
Assault and harassment offenses
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Disability assistance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Health personnel
Higher education
Law enforcement officers
Student aid and college costs
Violent crime
Worker safety and health