US SB1199 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-23 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and reauthorizes through FY2024 the national poison center network program. Specifically, the bill allows the use of other communication technologies (in addition to the national toll-free number) to access poison control centers and requires the program to include toxic exposure (in addition to poisoning) in nationwide media campaigns. Further, the bill modifies the waiver limitations for poison control center accreditation.
Title
Poison Center Network Enhancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-07-23 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4969; text: CR S4969) |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 138. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Licensing and registrations
Telephone and wireless communication
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Licensing and registrations
Telephone and wireless communication