US SB1192 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of the Treasury to regulate tax return preparers, including by sanctioning preparers for incompetence and disreputable behavior and by establishing minimum competency standards for preparers.
Title
Taxpayer Protection and Preparer Proficiency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1138 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3157 (Related) 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3330 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8501 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3157 (Related) 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3330 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB8501 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1192/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1192/BILLS-116s1192is.pdf |