US SB1191 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Point Reyes Coast Guard Housing Conveyance Act This bill directs the Coast Guard to convey 32 acres of federal land (including all buildings, structures, utilities, and facilities on the land) known as CAMSPAC Housing in Point Reyes Station to Marin County, California, to be used for affordable housing or to provide a public benefit approved by the County. The property must be sold at fair market value. The Coast Guard may deposit the proceeds in the Coast Guard Housing Fund. The Coast Guard's authority to convey the property expires after four years.
Title
Point Reyes Coast Guard Housing Conveyance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1402 (Same As) 2015-03-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
SB1611 (Related) 2015-11-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302.
HB3030 (Related) 2016-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355.
SB1611 (Related) 2015-11-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302.
HB3030 (Related) 2016-03-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 355.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1191/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1191/BILLS-114s1191is.pdf |