US SB119 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize the Office on Violence Against Women to improve the handling of crimes of domestic violence, dating violence, sexual assault, and stalking by incorporating a trauma-informed approach into the initial response to and investigation of such crimes.
Title
Abby Honold Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB649 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB1620 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR233 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1620 (Related) 2022-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR233 (Similar To) 2021-03-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/119/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s119/BILLS-117s119is.pdf |