US SB1170 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-01 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize and update the Project Safe Childhood program, and for other purposes.
Title
Project Safe Childhood Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Jon Ossoff [D-GA] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Pete Ricketts [R-NE] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-01 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-11-01 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5150-5152; text: CR S5150-5152) |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 68. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Durbin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2661 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.