US SB1169 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 54.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses various foreign relations issues, with a focus on China. Among other things, the bill requires the U.S. Agency for Global Media to take certain actions to support independent journalism and combat censorship in countries where the Chinese Communist Party or other entities are promoting disinformation; requires the Department of State to establish programs to engage partner countries on issues such as regulatory harmonization and technology partnerships; prohibits any individual who has served as Secretary of State or Deputy Secretary of State from representing a foreign government entity before the executive branch; requires the State Department to develop and implement a plan for increasing the U.S. presence in the Indo-Pacific region; authorizes various foreign military financing and diplomatic activities in Southeast Asia and the Indo-Pacific region; prioritizes the transfer of excess defense articles to Taiwan, Thailand, Indonesia, Vietnam, and Malaysia; prohibits a country from receiving certain U.S. assistance if that country hosts a Chinese military installation within its territory, with some exceptions; authorizes the U.S. representative to the Inter-American Development Bank to vote for an increase in the bank's capital stock; requires strategies to engage with other countries on issues such as managing relations with China; authorizes military training assistance activities in Latin America and the Caribbean; establishes an interagency working group to counter Chinese cyber aggression in Africa; authorizes activities to promote democracy in Hong Kong; and imposes sanctions on foreign individuals and entities responsible for certain abuses (e.g., forced labor and coercive abortions) in China's Xinjiang region.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strategic Competition Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 54.
2021-05-10SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-04-21SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
2021-04-15SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB413 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB1934 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
HB2329 (Related) 2021-04-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB3084 (Related) 2021-05-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation.
HB3433 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB1824 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2033 (Related) 2021-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects

Abortion
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Afghanistan
Africa
Alliances
Arctic and polar regions
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Atmospheric science and weather
Australia
Border security and unlawful immigration
Business investment and capital
Business records
Canada
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
China
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Detention of persons
Digital media
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Executive agency funding and structure
Family planning and birth control
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Foreign loans and debt
Free trade and trade barriers
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Hong Kong
Human rights
India
Indonesia
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Japan
Labor standards
Latin America
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marshall Islands
Micronesia
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Mining
Multilateral development programs
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New Zealand
News media and reporting
North Korea
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Organized crime
Pacific Ocean
Pakistan
Palau
Philippines
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Securities
Singapore
Small business
Smuggling and trafficking
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Taiwan
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Thailand
Tibet
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
United Kingdom
United Nations
Vietnam
Water use and supply
Western Hemisphere
World health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback