US SB1166 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently allow a tax deduction at the time an investment in qualified property is made.
Title
ALIGN Act Accelerate Long-term Investment Growth Now Act
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB197 (Related) 2021-02-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2558 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4792 (Related) 2021-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB5649 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2558 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4792 (Related) 2021-09-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
HB5649 (Related) 2021-10-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/1166/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s1166/BILLS-117s1166is.pdf |