US SB116 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-111.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-111.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Consumer Product Safety Commission to study the effect of the COVID-19 pandemic on injuries and deaths associated with consumer products, and for other purposes.
Title
COVID–19 Home Safety Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-111. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 205. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment. Without written report. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB798 (Related) 2021-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.