US SB1149 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent the tax deduction for qualified business income. (Under current law, the deduction expires after December 31, 2025.)
Title
Main Street Tax Certainty Act
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB216 (Same As) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6396 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1149/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1149/BILLS-116s1149is.pdf |