US SB1147 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-2)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DISCLOSE Act of 2019 Democracy Is Strengthened by Casting Light On Spending in Elections Act of 2019 This bill expands prohibitions and requires additional disclosures related to political spending. Specifically, foreign nationals are further restricted regarding their involvement in election related activity, including by prohibiting their participation in the decision-making process regarding an election expenditure. Existing foreign money prohibitions are expanded to prohibit disbursements for paid internet or digital communications. The Federal Election Commission must perform an audit after each election cycle to determine the incidence of illicit foreign money. In general, organizations making political expenditures must disclose donors who have contributed $10,000 or more during an election cycle. Certain of these organizations, including corporations, must also disclose their beneficial owners. The bill requires organizations to provide additional disclosures on certain political ads, including the donors who contributed the most money to that organization in the last year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISCLOSE Act of 2019 Democracy Is Strengthened by Casting Light On Spending in Elections Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Same As/Similar To

SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2977 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB4612 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback