US SB1104 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises reporting and strategy requirements related to recovery and assistance efforts for Haiti. Specifically, the bill repeals existing reporting and strategy requirements related to earthquake recovery and economic assistance for Haiti. Further, the bill directs the Department of State to undertake specific initiatives that prioritize and assess the protection and preservation of human rights, the promotion of press and assembly freedoms and the protection of journalists, anticorruption efforts, and a strategy of post-disaster and post-pandemic recovery and development efforts. The State Department must also submit a report concerning the July 7, 2021, assassination of former Haitian President Jovenel Moïse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Haiti Development, Accountability, and Institutional Transparency Initiative Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-28SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 157.
2021-10-28SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2021-10-19SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2021-04-13SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
HR504 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects

Atmospheric science and weather
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Food assistance and relief
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Haiti
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Judges
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Latin America
Natural disasters
News media and reporting
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Protest and dissent
Public contracts and procurement
Reconstruction and stabilization
Rule of law and government transparency
Small business
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Violent crime
Water use and supply
Women's rights

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback