US SB1092 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Interstate Transport Act of 2018 This bill permits an individual to transport a knife for any lawful purpose between two places (e.g., states) where it is legal to possess and carry such knife. The individual must comply with specified requirements. The bill prohibits the arrest or detention of an individual for a knife violation unless there is probable cause to believe the individual failed to comply with specified requirements. An individual may assert compliance with this bill's requirements as a claim or defense in any civil or criminal action or proceeding.
Title
Interstate Transport Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-12 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4073 Amendment SA 4073 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4073 Amendment SA 4073 proposed by Senator Perdue for Senator Thune. (consideration: CR S7448-7449; text: CR S7448-7449) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7448-7449; text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7448) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | An errata sheet on written report No. 115-327 was printed. (text: 115S.Rept.327 errata) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 560. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-327. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Federal preemption
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Federal preemption
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security