US SB1085 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes appropriations through FY2024 to the Department of Energy (DOE) for research, development, engineering, demonstration, and commercial application of innovative vehicle technologies. Among other things, the bill requires DOE to conduct a program on materials, technologies, and processes with the potential to substantially reduce or eliminate petroleum use and the emissions of U.S. passenger and commercial vehicles, including in the areas of natural gas and hydrogen vehicle technologies, electrification of vehicle systems, and hydraulic hybrid technologies; implement a program of advanced vehicle manufacturing technologies and practices, including innovative processes to increase the production rate and decrease the cost of advanced battery and fuel cell manufacturing; and seek opportunities to leverage resources and support initiatives of state and local governments in developing and promoting advanced vehicle technologies, manufacturing, and infrastructure.
Title
Vehicle Innovation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-83. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2170 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
Air quality
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Manufacturing
Materials
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public transit
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation and public works
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Manufacturing
Materials
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Performance measurement
Public transit
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Transportation and public works