US SB1082 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth provisions to prevent discrimination and harassment in the workplace and raises the minimum wage for tipped employees. Specifically, the bill (1) makes it an unlawful employment practice to discriminate against an individual in the workplace based on sexual orientation, gender identity, pregnancy, childbirth, a medical condition related to pregnancy or childbirth, and a sex stereotype; (2) prohibits employers from entering into contracts or agreements with workers that contain certain nondisparagement or nondisclosure clauses; (3) prohibits predispute arbitration agreements and postdispute agreements with certain exceptions, and (4) establishes grant programs to prevent and respond to workplace discrimination and harassment, provide legal assistance for low-income workers related to employment discrimination, and establish a system of legal advocacy in states to protect the rights of workers. Additionally, the bill, among other things requires employers who have 15 or more employees to adopt a comprehensive nondiscrimination policy; requires the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission to provide specified training and resource materials, establish and convene a harassment prevention task force, and establish an Office of Education and Outreach with regard to prohibited discrimination and harassment in employment; requires specified studies, reports, and research on prohibited harassment in employment; and grants employees the right to retain their tips.
Title
BE HEARD in the Workplace Act Bringing an End to Harassment by Enhancing Accountability and Rejecting Discrimination in the Workplace Act
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1491 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2148 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2749 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB2148 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB2749 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Age discrimination
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Assault and harassment offenses
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Congressional agencies
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Contracts and agency
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Indian social and development programs
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Lawyers and legal services
Library of Congress
Public contracts and procurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Self-employed
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Women's employment
Advisory bodies
Age discrimination
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Assault and harassment offenses
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Congressional agencies
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Contracts and agency
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Indian social and development programs
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Lawyers and legal services
Library of Congress
Public contracts and procurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Self-employed
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1082/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1082/BILLS-116s1082is.pdf |