US SB1081 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-14-3)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent, beginning in FY2020, funding for the Land and Water Conservation Fund (LWCF). The President shall annually submit to Congress specified details regarding the allocation of funds to the LWCF. Congress may provide for alternate allocations using specified procedures.
Title
Land and Water Conservation Fund Permanent Funding Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 429. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. Without written report. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3195 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222.
SB3422 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 438.
SB3684 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB1957 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-152. (TXT | PDF)
HB7092 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3422 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 438.
SB3684 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
HB1957 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-152. (TXT | PDF)
HB7092 (Related) 2020-06-04 - Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Appropriations
Congressional oversight
Government trust funds
Hunting and fishing
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Congressional oversight
Government trust funds
Hunting and fishing
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources