US SB108 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-65.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the Seminole Tribe of Florida to lease, sell, convey, warrant, or transfer its real property that is not held in trust by the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to authorize the Seminole Tribe of Florida to lease or transfer certain land, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-02 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 425 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-65.
2021-11-23SenateSigned by President.
2021-11-16SenatePresented to President.
2021-11-02HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-11-02HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 425 - 2 (Roll no. 345).
2021-11-02HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6096-6097)
2021-11-01HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-11-01HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 108.
2021-11-01HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6048)
2021-11-01HouseMs. Leger Fernandez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-05-28HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-05-28HouseReceived in the House.
2021-05-27SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-05-26SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3490; text: CR S3490)
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38.
2021-04-14SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-10.
2021-03-10SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-01-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB164 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback